EP1677180 - Touchscreen capable of detecting two simultaneous touch locations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prados, Michael 4009 Miranda Avenue 94304 Palo Alto / US | 02 /
Alessandrini, Philippe 443 Addison Avenue 94301 Palo Alto CA / US | 03 /
Bloehs, Wolfgang Rohrbachstrasse 17 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [2006/27] | Application number, filing date | 05025836.7 | 26.11.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | US20040640360P | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 640360 P | [2006/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677180 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/038 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/0414 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F2203/014 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | Berührungsempfindlicher Bilschirm der zwei gleichzeitige Berührungspunkte erkennt | [2006/27] | English: | Touchscreen capable of detecting two simultaneous touch locations | [2006/27] | French: | Écran tactile capable de reconnaitre deux points de contact simultanés | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/18] | 15.02.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/18] | Appeal following examination | 02.03.2018 | Appeal received No. T2069/18 | 11.06.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.04.2019 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/14] | 21.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 21.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001134382 ; | [X]US4914624 (DUNTHORN DAVID I [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 4, lines 4-44 * * column 5, lines 1-16 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, lines 34-55 * * column 8, lines 5-52 *; | [XY]EP0773496 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, lines 11-25 * * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 1 * * column 5, lines 24-37 * * claim 1 * [Y] 6; | [X]WO03032141 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 8, lines 9-21 * * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 4 *; | [YD]WO03038800 (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [YD] 6 * abstract * * page 23, lines 4-17 *; | [X]US2003095112 (KAWANO SEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0035] - [0047] *; | [XP]US6958749 (MATSUSHITA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3 * column 2, lines 18-28 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 41 ** column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 38 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001134382 A 20010518 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | Examination | US4914624 | JP2001134382 | WO03032141 | WO03038800 | US2003095112 | - Anonymous, "Windows 95: Getting Started", (20000707), URL: https://www.ccsf.edu/Pub/Fac/win95.html, (20160725), XP055291093 |