EP1630079 - Operator's cab for work vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOMATSU LTD. 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Tadashi, c/o Komatsu Ltd. Osaka Plant, 1-1, Ueno 3-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Tsuji, Koudou, c/o Komatsu Ltd. Osaka Plant, 1-1, Ueno 3-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025906.8 | 09.07.2003 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020201393 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002201393 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630079 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630079 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06, B62D25/04 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B62D33/0617 (EP);
B62D25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/09] | Title | German: | Fahrerkabine eines Arbeitsfahrzeugs | [2006/09] | English: | Operator's cab for work vehicle | [2006/09] | French: | Cabine de conduite pour véhicule de travail | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 16.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03015453.8 / EP1380497 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000192511 ; | [A]US4605259 (HURLBURT JOSEPH C [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 1, lines 40-60; figure 2; claims 1,4,11 *; | [A]DE19635751 (LIEBHERR WERK BISCHOFSHOFEN [AT]) [A] 1-14 * columns 2-3; figure 1 *; | [A]US6315351 (MONDRAGON SARMIENTO FRANCISCO [MX], et al) [A] 1* columns 2-5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1197367 (STILL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0011] - [0021]; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000192511 A 20000711 (TAKAHASHI WORKS:KK) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH11166247 |