EP1672759 - Frame for frontal flush snapmounting of electrical installation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Hans-Joachim Turnstrasse 25 67706 Krickenbach / DE | 02 /
Moschenros, Michel 14, rue Principale 67240 Kurtzenhouse / FR | 03 /
Schwarz, Jürgen Am Nabenberg 23 67705 Trippstadt / DE | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Patentanwälte Möll, Bitterich & Dr. Keller Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025934.0 | 29.11.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | DE20042019345U | 15.12.2004 Original published format: DE 202004019345 U | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672759 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672759 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12, H02G3/08 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
H02G3/086 (EP);
H02G3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Geräteeinbaurahmen für den frontrastenden Einbau von Elektro-Installationsgeräten | [2006/25] | English: | Frame for frontal flush snapmounting of electrical installation apparatus | [2006/25] | French: | Cadre de montage à affleurement par encliquetage de face d' un appareillage d'installation électrique . | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8405523U (RICHARD GIERSIEPEN GMBH & CO KG, 5630 REMSCHEID, DE) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0289410 (LEGRAND SA [FR]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [X]FR2776134 (LEGRAND SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10227401 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure - * | by applicant | DE7803034U | EP0844714 | EP0913902 | EP1059719 | EP1271734 |