EP1667235 - Electroluminescence display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hak, Su Kim SK Bukhansancity Apt. 143-903 Mia 7-dong Gangbuk-gu Seoul 142-779 / KR | 02 /
Hyo, Dae Bae Cheonggu Town 102-1003 Yongsan-dong Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-748 / KR | [2014/03] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
Hak, Su Kim SK Bukhansancity Apt. 143-903 Mia 7-dong Gangbuk-gu Seoul 142-779 / KR | ||
02 /
Hyo, Dae Bae Cheonggu Town 102-1003 Yongsan-dong Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-748 / KR | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Schwepnitzer Str. 2 01097 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025976.1 | 29.11.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | KR20040100072 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004100072 | KR20040107430 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004107430 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1667235 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1667235 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667235 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52, H01L51/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H10K59/173 (EP,US);
H10K50/813 (US);
H10K50/828 (US);
H10K59/80515 (EP);
H10K59/80524 (EP);
H10K50/805 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | H01L27/32, H01L27/15, H01L51/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/23] | H01L27/32, H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | Elektrolumineszenzanzeigevorrichtung | [2006/23] | English: | Electroluminescence display device | [2006/23] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent | [2013/25] |
Former [2006/23] | Dispositif daffichage électroluminescent | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2005 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5399936 (NAMIKI TOHRU [JP], et al); | [A]JP2001085162 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2001217081 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2001313182 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]US2002164415 (VAN DER SCHAFT LUCIEN MARIA JO [NL], et al); | [X]EP1286397 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XY]EP1304743 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]US2004140759 (PARK JOON-YOUNG [KR], et al) |