EP1630816 - Universal memory element, encryption method and method of controlling an interconnection element to change connectivity in a neural network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/09] | Universal memory element and method of programming same | ||
[2008/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 2956 Waterview Drive Rochester Hills Michigan 48309 / US | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ovshinsky, Stanford R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48013 / US | 02 /
Pashmakov, Boil 2133 Jarman Troy, MI 48098 / US | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2006/09] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05026045.4 | 10.06.1999 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | US19980102887 | 23.06.1998 Original published format: US 102887 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1630816 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1630816 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/02 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G11C11/5678 (EP,US);
G11C13/0004 (EP,US);
G11C13/004 (EP,US);
G11C13/0069 (EP,US);
G11C11/54 (EP,US);
G11C2013/0078 (EP,US);
H10B63/20 (EP,US);
H10N70/231 (EP,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | G11C11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/46] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Universales Speicherelement, Verschlüsslungsverfahren und Steuerungsverfahren eines Verbindungselements zur Veränderung der Verbundfähigkeit in einem neuronalen Netzwerk. | [2008/50] | English: | Universal memory element, encryption method and method of controlling an interconnection element to change connectivity in a neural network | [2008/50] | French: | Elément mémoire universel, procédé de cryptage et procédé de contrôle d'un élément d'interconnection pour changer la connectivité dans un réseau neuronal | [2008/50] |
Former [2006/09] | Universelles Speicherelement und Verfahren zu dessen Programmierung | ||
Former [2006/09] | Universal memory element and method of programming same | ||
Former [2006/09] | Élément de mémoire universelle et son procédé de programmation | Examination procedure | 30.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99931788.6 / EP1097456 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0479325 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-14* column 7, line 16 - column 12, line 6 *; | [A]WO9705665 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, line 17 - page 13, line 9 * * page 32, line 13 - line 31 * |