EP1668976 - Method and apparatus for a constant supply of biomass to the transport- and working-implements of a self-propelled harvesting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Langlott, Jürgen Vor der Höhe 14 37327 Wingerode / DE | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Seckel, Uwe Patentanwalt Markt 4 06556 Artern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Seckel, Uwe Patentanwalt Markt 4 06556 Artern / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026562.8 | 06.12.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | DE20041059295 | 09.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004059295 | [2006/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668976 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01D47/00, A01D41/06 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A01D47/00 (EP);
A01D41/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur konstanten Zuführung von Biomasse zu den Transport- und Arbeitseinheiten einer selbstfahrenden Erntemaschine | [2006/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for a constant supply of biomass to the transport- and working-implements of a self-propelled harvesting machine | [2006/24] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'alimentation constante de biomasse aux éléments de transport et de travail d'une moissonneuse automotrice | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2418995 (BACHL, ALOIS; BACHL, FRANZ, 8335 FALKENBERG, DE) [DA] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US3399517 (MAGEE KENNETH L) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DD10896 (KIRSCH, PAUL) [A] 1,3 * the whole document * |