blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1640847

EP1640847 - Dynamic random access memory (DRAM) semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2016Revocation of patentpublished on 09.11.2016  [2016/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2010/50]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
Rambus, Inc.
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Farmwald, Michael
190 Golden Oak Drive
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
02 / Horowitz, Mark A.
1309 San Mateo Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2006/24]
Former [2006/13]01 / Farmwald, Michael
190 Golden Oak Drive
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
02 / Horowitz, Mark
2024 Columbia Street
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/13]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date05026720.216.04.1991
[2006/13]
Priority number, dateUS1990051089818.04.1990         Original published format: US 510898
[2006/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1640847
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1640847
Date:31.05.2006
[2006/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1640847
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2006
ClassificationIPC:G06F13/42
[2006/22]
CPC:
G11C7/1066 (EP,US); G06F11/006 (EP,US); G06F12/0215 (EP,US);
G06F12/0661 (EP,US); G06F12/0684 (EP,US); G06F13/1605 (EP,US);
G06F13/161 (EP,US); G06F13/1678 (EP,US); G06F13/1689 (EP,US);
G06F13/1694 (EP,US); G06F13/376 (EP,US); G06F13/4239 (EP,US);
G11C11/4076 (EP,US); G11C11/4096 (EP,US); G11C29/88 (EP,US);
G11C5/00 (EP,US); G11C5/04 (EP,US); G11C5/06 (EP,US);
G11C5/063 (EP,US); G11C5/066 (EP,US); G11C7/1006 (EP,US);
G11C7/1012 (EP,US); G11C7/1045 (EP,US); G11C7/1051 (EP,US);
G11C7/1057 (EP,US); G11C7/1069 (EP,US); G11C7/1072 (EP,US);
G11C7/1078 (EP,US); G11C7/1084 (EP,US); G11C7/22 (EP,US);
G11C7/222 (EP,US); G11C7/225 (EP,US); G11C8/00 (EP,US);
G06F11/1048 (EP,US); G11C2207/105 (EP,US); G11C2207/108 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2006/13]G06F1/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/06]
Former [2006/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterbauelement mit dynamischem Arbeitsspeicher (DRAM)[2006/13]
English:Dynamic random access memory (DRAM) semiconductor device[2006/13]
French:Dispositif à semi-conducteurs à mémoire vive dynamique (DRAM)[2006/13]
Examination procedure16.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/32]
18.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2007Fee for grant paid
16.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00100018.1  / EP1022641
EP91908374.1  / EP0525068
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.03.2008  03.07.2013  WITHDRAWN
SK hynix Deutschland GmbH
Am Prime Parc 13
65479 Raunheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  13.03.2008  04.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
MICRON EUROPE Ltd
Micron House Wellington Business Park Dukes Ride
Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6LS / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2015/35]
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2008  03.07.2013  WITHDRAWN
SK hynix Deutschland GmbH
Am Prime Parc 13
65479 Raunheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Urner, Peter, et al, et al
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 02  13.03.2008  04.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
MICRON EUROPE Ltd
Micron House Wellington Business Park Dukes Ride
Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6LS / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2013/33]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2008  03.07.2013  WITHDRAWN
SK hynix Deutschland GmbH
Am Prime Parc 13
65479 Raunheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Urner, Peter, et al, et al
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 02  13.03.2008  20.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
MICRON EUROPE Ltd
Micron House Wellington Business Park Dukes Ride
Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6LS / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2012/41]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2008  19.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
SK hynix Deutschland GmbH
Am Prime Parc 13
65479 Raunheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Urner, Peter, et al, et al
ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
 02  13.03.2008  20.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
MICRON EUROPE Ltd
Micron House Wellington Business Park Dukes Ride
Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6LS / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2008  19.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH
Kelsterbacher Strasse 16
65479 Raunheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Urner, Peter, et al, et al
ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
 02  13.03.2008  20.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
MICRON EUROPE Ltd
Micron House Wellington Business Park Dukes Ride
Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6LS / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2008/17]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2008  19.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Hynix Semiconductor Deutschland GmbH
Kelsterbacher Strasse 16
65479 Raunheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Urner, Peter, et al, et al
ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
 02  13.03.2008  20.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
MICRON EUROPE Ltd
Micron House Wellington Business Park Dukes Ride
Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6LS / GB
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square
GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB
21.04.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.12.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.06.2011Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.10.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
13.08.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/45]
Appeal following opposition09.11.2011Appeal received No.  T2347/11
01.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
25.07.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
16.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2012Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 14
07.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 15
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 16
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 17
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR08.02.2008
GB15.04.2011
DE16.04.2011
[2013/31]
Former [2008/32]FR08.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2201569  (INT COMPUTERS LTD) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 10 - line 13 * * column A *;
 [A]US4805198  (STERN KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1-11* column A; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4817058  (PINKHAM RAYMOND [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 34 - line 60 *;
 [Y]EP0339224  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.