EP1688040 - Pesticidal composition comprising pyriproxyfen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanedani, Toshiyuki 8-7-20-335, Hon-machi Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0021 / JP | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026767.3 | 07.12.2005 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040360988 | 14.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004360988 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688040 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688040 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/40, A01P7/04, A01N25/30, A01N25/04 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N25/30, A01N25/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | Pyriproxyfen enthaltende Pestizidzusammensetzung | [2006/32] | English: | Pesticidal composition comprising pyriproxyfen | [2006/32] | French: | Composition pesticide comprenant du pyriproxyfen | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | LT | 19.09.2007 | LV | 19.09.2007 | SI | 19.09.2007 | IE | 07.12.2007 | LU | 07.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | IS | 19.01.2008 | [2016/07] |
Former [2009/45] | EE | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
TR | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 07.12.2007 | ||
LU | 07.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | EE | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 07.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | EE | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 07.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 07.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 19.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07285803 ; | [A]JPH10120502 ; | [DA]US4751225 (NISHIDA SUMIO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-7 * column 72, line 9 - line 15 * * column 72, line 50 - line 55 *; | [DA]JPH07285803 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0839448 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 56 *; | [DA]US6296864 (ZEN SHIGEKAZU [JP]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 22, Database accession no. 1996-006850, XP002383704 & JPH07285803 A 19951031 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LT) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 29, Database accession no. 1998-328334, XP002383703 & JPH10120502 A 19980512 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, XP002383700 [ ] * column A * | [ ] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 124:79477, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002383734 [ ] * column A * |