EP1796408 - Radio communication after the switch-on of a subscriber station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Färber, Michael Schiessstättstrasse 12a 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 02 /
Kroth, Norbert Körnerweg 1 14482 Potsdam / DE | [2007/24] | Application number, filing date | 05026962.0 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796408 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1796408 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H04W60/04 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Title | German: | Funkkommunikation im Anschluss an das Einschalten einer Teilnehmerstation | [2007/24] | English: | Radio communication after the switch-on of a subscriber station | [2007/24] | French: | Communication radio après la mise en marche d'une station d'abonné | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.06.2008 | CZ | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | EE | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IE | 18.06.2008 | IT | 18.06.2008 | LT | 18.06.2008 | LV | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | RO | 18.06.2008 | SI | 18.06.2008 | SK | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | BG | 18.09.2008 | SE | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | IS | 18.10.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | AT | 09.12.2008 | LU | 09.12.2008 | HU | 19.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | FR | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 19.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 19.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 09.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
LV | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 18.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0152432 (XIRCOM INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 10 - line 12 * * page 4, line 2 - line 21 * * page 7, line 2 - line 24 * * page 18, line 30 - page 22, line 19 * * page 33, line 18 - page 34, line 9 * * figure 8c *; | [A]US6519457 (JIANG JIANPING [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 13 - line 17 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 36 ** column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 9 * |