Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005059623 | 27.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001573 | 13.01.2005 | DE102005059623 | 14.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7540299 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2009 | B2 | US2006174950 | 10.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001573 | 13.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006194447 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005001573 | 13.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1681486 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2007 | A3 | EP1681486 | 19.07.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102005001573 | 13.01.2005 |