EP1681486 - System and method for cooling a vehicle clutch comprising a valve device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Eric Gärtnereistrasse 39 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
Homm, Manfred Prälat-Brommer-Strasse 15 77815 Bühl-Neusatz / DE | [2006/29] | Application number, filing date | 05027259.0 | 14.12.2005 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | DE20051001573 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005001573 | [2006/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1681486 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1681486 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/02 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
F16D25/123 (EP,US);
F16D48/02 (EP,US);
F16D2048/0209 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2615 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2663 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Kühlen einer Kupplung eines Fahrzeuges mit einer Ventileinrichtung | [2006/29] | English: | System and method for cooling a vehicle clutch comprising a valve device | [2006/29] | French: | Système et procédé de refroidissement d'embrayage de véhicule automobile comprenant un dispositif de soupape | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB706853 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,5-8,16,20 * page 3, lines 8-13; figure 2 *; | [XY]US3862676 (SCHALL MYRON M) [X] 1,5,6,8,16,18 * column 1, lines 33-55; figure 2 * [Y] 2-4,15,17,19; | [Y]GB2081413 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [Y] 2-4,15,17,19 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3532673 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 12,13* figure 1/1 *; | [AD]DE102004005790 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [AD] 7,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004005790 |