EP1675253 - Method for the operation of a home automation network comprising an actuator and a control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somfy SAS 50, Avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumont d'Ayot, Geoffrey 37, Avenue Champ Fleuri 74600 Seynod / FR | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/26] | Bugnion Genève BUGNION S.A. Case 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 05027325.9 | 14.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | FR20040013655 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413655 | [2006/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1675253 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1675253 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1675253 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/42, E05F15/10, E06B9/68, H02P1/44 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H02P1/44 (EP,US);
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
H02J13/00007 (EP,US);
H02J13/00032 (EP);
E05F15/00 (EP,US);
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/554 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/822 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/73 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/106 (EP,US);
E06B9/68 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (US);
Y02B90/20 (EP,US);
Y04S20/221 (US);
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | H02P1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Heimnetzwerkes mit einer Betätigungseinrichtung und einer Steuereinheit | [2006/26] | English: | Method for the operation of a home automation network comprising an actuator and a control unit | [2006/26] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'une installation domotique comprenant un actionneur et une unité de commande | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2005 | AT | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002199786 ; | [A]JPH1181823 ; | [DXA]EP0822315 (SELVE ERNST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [DX] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 5; | [DA]FR2806850 (SOMFY [FR]) [DA] 6 * abstract *; | [XA]EP1154121 (FOUR GROUP M [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 44; figure 3 * [A] 5,12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002199786 A 20020712 (YKK CORP) [A] 6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11081823 A 19990326 (SHARP CORP) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | FR2811703 |