EP1799009 - Laminated piezoelectric transducer and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Undersea Systems International, Inc. Dba Ocean Technology Systems 3133 W. Harvard St. Santa Ana, CA 92704 / US | [2008/50] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Undersea Systems International, Inc. Dba Ocean Technology Systems 2950 Airway Avenue, D-3 Costa Mesa CA 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peck, Jerry 27522 Agrado Street Mission Viejo, California 92692 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05027342.4 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799009 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799009 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/44 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
H04R1/44 (EP);
H04R17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | Laminierter piezoelektrischer Wandler und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2007/25] | English: | Laminated piezoelectric transducer and method of manufacturing the same | [2007/25] | French: | Transducteur piézoélectrique stratifié et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 25.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07109446.0 / EP1819191 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | LV | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3909529 (MORROW CHARLES T, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-20; | [XA]GB1546521 (FRANCE ARMED FORCES) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-20; | [Y]US4454927 (SEEBINGER FREDERICK L [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, lines 40-43; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP0317167 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line L - column 6, line 6; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5117403 (EBERL ADOLF [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 7-10 * * column 3, lines 20-22,38-42 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 14; figure 3 *; | [YA]WO9521512 (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 8 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 21; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 2-20; | [A]EP0669169 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 1-11 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 42 * * column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 5; figures 1A,1B,3 *; | [XA]US5812496 (PECK JEROME [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-20; | [A]US6545948 (JIANG GEJING [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 6,7 * * column 3, lines 1-15; figures 1A,1B *; | [YA]US2003123692 (UEKI MASATAKA [JP]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0097] - [0100]; figures 5A,5B,6 * [A] 2-20; | [YA]US6693849 (EBERL ADOLF [CA], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 45; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-20; | [A]WO2005112503 (DIVER ENTERTAINMENT SYTSEMS IN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0002] , [0121] - [0129]; figures 21A,21B,21C,21D,22 * |