EP1686281 - Automatic slack adjuster for a disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgartner, Johann Thonstetten 23 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05027590.8 | 16.12.2005 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | DE20051003648 | 26.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005003648 | [2006/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686281 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686281 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/38 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
F16D65/568 (EP);
F16D2055/0062 (EP);
F16D2065/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Title | German: | Nachstellvorrichtung für eine Scheibenbremse | [2006/31] | English: | Automatic slack adjuster for a disc brake | [2006/31] | French: | Régleur automatique de jeu pour un frein à disque | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IE | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | LT | 02.09.2009 | LV | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | ES | 13.12.2009 | AT | 16.12.2009 | LU | 16.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | IS | 02.01.2010 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
AT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LU | 16.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
LU | 16.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9806608 (KELSEY HAYES CO [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DY]DE19731696 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [DY] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US6257377 (SCHUMANN FRANK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE10243596 (MITUTOYO CORP KAWASAKI [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE10201221 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |