Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8501240 | ![]() | 06.08.2013 | B2 | US2009117193 | 07.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98550904 | 10.11.2004 | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US34336508 | 23.12.2008 | US31334302 | 06.12.2002 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US54875900 | 13.04.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7482024 | ![]() | 27.01.2009 | B2 | US2005147567 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98550904 | 10.11.2004 | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US31334302 | 06.12.2002 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US54875900 | 13.04.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4859320B | ![]() | 25.01.2012 | B2 | JP2003513031 | 08.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1223915 | ![]() | 21.12.2005 | B1 | EP1223915 | 24.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU775565B | ![]() | 05.08.2004 | B2 | AU4235300 | 14.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1666028 | ![]() | 24.03.2010 | B1 | EP1666028 | 07.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | EP00922117 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE313318T | 15.01.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2389219 | 23.06.2009 | C | CA2389219 | 10.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1110136T | 14.01.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | EP05027610 | 12.04.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60025019T | 24.08.2006 | T2 | DE60025019D1 | 26.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1666028T | 21.06.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | EP00922117 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2254164T | 16.06.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2343124T | 23.07.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU229310 | 28.10.2013 | B1 | HUP0301851 | 28.07.2006 | A3 | HUP0301851 | 29.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL149085 | 15.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02004193 | 13.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO332144B | 02.07.2012 | B1 | NO20021800L | 24.06.2002 | L | NO20021800D0 | 17.04.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ518401 | 30.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US0009785 | 12.04.2000 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6835372 | 28.12.2004 | B2 | US2003186894 | 02.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US31334302 | 06.12.2002 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US54875900 | 13.04.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6518239 | 11.02.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US54875900 | 13.04.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200202855 | 29.10.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0132144 | ![]() | 10.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100702878B | ![]() | 04.04.2007 | B1 | KR20020060218 | 16.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011093922 | ![]() | 12.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE461692T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1188111C | 09.02.2005 | C | CN1384733 | 11.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60044070D1 | 06.05.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1223915T | 06.03.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1092687 | 16.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1666028E | 15.06.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI310688B | 11.06.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | US17276999 | 20.12.1999 | US16423699 | 08.11.1999 | US17838300 | 27.01.2000 | US17841500 | 27.01.2000 | US16245199 | 29.10.1999 | Type | ![]() | EP1223915 |