EP1637166 - Virus-like particles for the induction of autoantibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT as represented by THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 325, 6011 Executive Boulevard Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiller, John T. 9630 Dewmar Lane Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 02 /
Chackerian, Bryce Apt. 1 2 Fairfax Court Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | 03 /
Lowy, Douglas R. 8519 Rosewood Drive Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2006/34] |
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
Schiller, John T. 11306 Maple View Drive Silver Spring, MD 20902 / US | ||
02 /
Chackerian, Bryce Apt. 1 2 Fairfax Court Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | |||
03 /
Lowy, Douglas R. 4709 South Chelsea Lane Bethesda, MD 20879 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05027951.2 | 20.10.1999 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | US19980105132P | 21.10.1998 Original published format: US 105132 P | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1637166 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1637166 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, C07K14/005, C07K16/28, C07K16/24, C07K17/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP);
A61K47/665 (EP);
A61K47/6901 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K16/241 (EP);
C07K16/2866 (EP);
C07K17/06 (EP);
C07K2317/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/12] | Title | German: | Virusähnliche Partikel zur Induktion von Autoantikörpern | [2006/12] | English: | Virus-like particles for the induction of autoantibodies | [2006/12] | French: | Particules assimilées à des virus pour l'induction d'auto-anticorps | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 03.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99970772.2 / EP1123114 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990970772) is 12.06.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9929723 (PENTAMER PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,7,11,13,15 * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 9 * * tables 2,3 * * examples 2,5 * * claims 1,13,14,43 *; | [X] - ADAMS S E, "Induction of humoral and cellular immunity by recombinant, particulate antigen presentation systems", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1993), Database accession no. EMB-1994076722, XP002367358 [X] 1,2,20,21,24,26,29 * abstract * | [PX] - CHACKERIAN B ET AL, "Induction of autoantibodies to mouse CCR5 with recombinant papillomavirus particles", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19990302), vol. 96, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2373 - 2378, XP002133522 [PX] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.5.2373 | [ ] - VACCINE RESEARCH 1993 UNITED STATES, (1993), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1056-7909, pages 163 - 172 |