EP1692998 - Ophthalmological analysis system for the measurement of the intraocular pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oculus Optikgeräte GmbH Münchholzhäuser Strasse 29 35582 Wetzlar-Dutenhofen / DE | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köst, Gert Höltystrasse 7 30171 Hannover / DE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | von den Steinen, Axel, et al advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | von den Steinen, Axel, et al Böck, Tappe, v.d. Steinen, Wiegand Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | von den Steinen, Axel Advotec. Böck, Tappe, Kirschner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05028292.0 | 23.12.2005 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | DE20052002562U | 16.02.2005 Original published format: DE 202005002562 U | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692998 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692998 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/16 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
A61B3/165 (EP,US);
A61B3/1005 (EP,US);
A61B3/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | Ophthalmisches Analysesystem zur Messung des intraokularen Drucks | [2010/51] | English: | Ophthalmological analysis system for the measurement of the intraocular pressure | [2006/34] | French: | Système d'analyse ophthalmologique permettant la mesure de la pression intraoculaire | [2006/34] |
Former [2006/34] | Ophthalmisches Analysesystem zur Messung des intraocularen Drucks | Examination procedure | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | HU | 17.08.2011 | IE | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | AT | 23.12.2011 | LU | 23.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
AT | 23.12.2011 | ||
LU | 23.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
AT | 23.12.2011 | ||
LU | 23.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 23.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 23.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5002056 (TAKAHASHI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-11,18-24 * abstract * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 38 * * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 21 * * column 7, line 65 - line 67 * * column 8, line 8 - line 14 * [Y] 13; | [XY]US5474066 (GROLMAN BERNARD [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12,14-16,19-25 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 40 * * figure 2 * [Y] 13; | [X]US6053867 (IIJIMA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12,25 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - line 35 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 48 * * column 6, line 20 - line 32 * * column 8, line 27 - line 58 *; | [X]WO03096888 (LUCENTE AMEDEO FRANCESCO ANTON [IT]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,19,20,25 * abstract * * page 6, line 4 - line 23 * * claims 1,5 ** page 8, line 17 - line 23 * | Examination | US6120444 |