EP1679201 - Flexibly equippable album with specific inner back element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heukers, Herman-Jan Berninistraat 29 3822 VA Amersfoort / NL | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/28] | Application number, filing date | 05075045.4 | 06.01.2005 | [2006/28] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679201 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B42D1/08, B42F3/00, B42F5/00 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
B42D1/08 (EP);
B42F11/00 (EP);
B42F13/0006 (EP);
B42F13/004 (EP);
B42F13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/12] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flexibel ausrüstbares Album mit spezifischem inneren Rückteil | [2006/28] | English: | Flexibly equippable album with specific inner back element | [2006/28] | French: | Album équipable d'une façon flexible avec une partie arrière specifique | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.03.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0130587 (LEUVERINK AREND JAN [NL]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 2 - page 5, line 30; figures 1,3,6 *; | [A]WO02090123 (LEUVERINK AREND JAN [NL]) [A] 1-6* the whole document * |