EP1681317 - Protective composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB SKF Hornsgatan 1 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2009/35] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states AB SKF Hornsgatan 1 S-415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meijer, Dick Heiligestraat 7 4001 DJ Tiel / NL | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/29] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, J.W. Frisolaan 13, P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05075106.4 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681317 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1681317 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L91/06, C08L91/08, C09D191/06, C09D191/08, F16C33/12 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
F16C33/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L91/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L91/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D191/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D191/08 (EP,KR,US);
C10M101/02 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L91/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L91/06, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L91/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L91/08, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C09D191/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C09D191/06, C08L2666/26 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | Schutzzusammensetzung | [2006/29] | English: | Protective composition | [2006/29] | French: | Composition de protection | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
04.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE FUCHS Europe Schmierstoffe GmbH Friesenheimer Str. 15 68169 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Georg, et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
04.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE FUCHS Europe Schmierstoffe GmbH Friesenheimer Str. 15 68169 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Georg, et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
FUCHS Europe Schmierstoffe GmbH Friesenheimer Str. 15 68169 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | 30.06.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.10.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/45] | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | IE | 14.01.2010 | LU | 14.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4464275 (YASUI HIROYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-16* example 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5106415 (DAVIDIAN MICHAEL [US]) [AD] 1-12,14,15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5888281 (LONGO MATTHEW W [US]) [A] 1-12,14,15 * example 1; claim 1 * |