EP1681803 - Patient device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik CRM Patent AG Mühlegasse 18 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK CRM Patent AG Mühlegasse 18 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diebold, Michael Immenweg 15 b 12169 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Fournie, Eric Bismarckstrasse 32 91054 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Horton, Jim 75 SW 89th Ave Portland OR 97225 / US | 04 /
Merlin, Julian Paretzer Strasse 4 10713 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Potschadtke, Jens Dompfaffstrasse 136 91056 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
Seidelt, Andre Schierkerstrasse 24HH 12051 Berlin / DE | 07 /
Stadnik, Paul 14094 Barrington Ct. Lake Oswego OR 97035-5733 / US | 08 /
Bode, Sven Lipaerstrasse 5 12203 Berlin / DE | 09 /
Nelson, Jim 3909 Bass Lane Lake Oswego OR 97034 / US | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L., et al Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L., et al Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L., et al BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/38] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05075125.4 | 18.01.2005 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681803 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, A61N1/372 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
A61N1/37252 (EP,US);
A61N1/37282 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H80/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/5692 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | Patientenvorrichtung | [2006/29] | English: | Patient device | [2006/29] | French: | Dispositif d'un patient | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0695075 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [A] 10 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 27 * * page 4, lines 28-44 *; | [A]WO0016540 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [A] 7* abstract *; | [A]US6131136 (LIEBENOW FRANK W [US], et al) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6574509 (KRAUS MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 29 * * column 4, line 10 - column 10, line 60; figure 1 * * column 15, line 48 - column 16, line 15; figure 4 *; | [A]US2003139778 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0084] , [0085]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0138] - [0152]; figures 6-9 *; | [Y]US6657989 (HILSENRATH MICHAEL [GB]) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 65; figures 1,5 * * column 10, lines 6-32 * * column 12, lines 29-61; figure 13 * |