Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7997215 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2011 | B2 | US2005199161 | 15.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200400128 | 09.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1574149 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200400128 | 09.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1015943 | 06.12.2005 | A5 | Priority number | Date | BE200400128 | 09.03.2004 |