EP1571424 - Apparatus for sensing angular positions of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godoy, Arquimedes Albaricoque 5732 32690 Juarez Chihuahua / MX | 02 /
Daniel, Martinez 1 Via Placita El Paso, TX 79927 / US | 03 /
Almaraz, Jose L. C. Quinta Elsa no. 1507C 32505 Juarez Chihuahua / MX | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, BP 60059, Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05075493.6 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | US20040792488 | 03.03.2004 Original published format: US 792488 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571424 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Winkelpositionssensorvorrichtung | [2005/36] | English: | Apparatus for sensing angular positions of an object | [2005/36] | French: | Dispositif capteur de position angulaire | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001066202 ; | [A]US3711776 (INAMI T, et al) [A] 1,2,14,15 * abstract *; | [A]US4728950 (HENDRICKSON MAX S [US], et al) [A] 12,13 * abstract *; | [A]DE19629611 (GRUTZECK CHRISTEL [DE]) [A] 1,14* figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001066202 A 20010316 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1-12,14-17 * abstract * |