EP1571192 - Fluoropolyether adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohte-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Oote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Oote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiono, Mikio, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Oaza Hitomi, Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun Gunma 379-0224 / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/36] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05075532.1 | 03.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040063206 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004063206 | JP20050051162 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005051162 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571192 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571192 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09J171/02, C08L71/02, C08G65/336, C08G65/00, C09J183/08, C08L83/08 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
C09J171/02 (EP,US);
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08G65/336 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (EP,US);
C09J183/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/541 (EP,US);
C08K5/5419 (EP,US);
C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/08, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C09J171/02, C08L83/00 (US,EP);
C09J183/08, C08L2666/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/21] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fluoropolyether Klebemittelzusammensetzung | [2005/36] | English: | Fluoropolyether adhesive composition | [2005/36] | French: | Composition adhésive a base de polyéther fluoré | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 08.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1081185 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0059] ** page 21, line 50 *; | [A]EP1122284 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0058] - [0063] *; | [A]EP1223194 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-6 * * paragraph [0052] *; | [PA]EP1413588 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0008] - [0016] - [0019] , [0033] , [0040] , [0044] *; | [PA]EP1486534 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * claims 1-14 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039] - [0058] * |