EP1579808 - Needle for body fluid tester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEG INCORPORATED 2800 Patton Road St. Paul, MN 55113 / US | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilgers, Michael E. 9818 59th Street Court North Lake Elmo, Minnesota 55042 / US | 02 /
Schmidt, Bruno J. c/o Integ, Inc., 2800 Patton Road St. Paul, Minnesota 55113 / US | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
Hilgers, Michael E. 179 Grandview Avenue Roseville, MN 55113 / US | ||
02 /
Schmidt, Bruno J. 5344 St. Stevens Street Moundsview, MN 55112 / US | Representative(s) | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 05075625.3 | 26.01.2000 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | US19990244952 | 04.02.1999 Original published format: US 244952 | US19990427161 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: US 427161 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579808 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579808 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61B10/0045 (EP,US);
A61B2010/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/39] | Title | German: | Nadel für Körperflüssigkeitstester | [2005/39] | English: | Needle for body fluid tester | [2005/39] | French: | Aiguille pour dispositif d'analyse de fluides corporels | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00913272.1 / EP1148820 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2010 | BE | 08.12.2010 | CY | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | NL | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | IE | 26.01.2011 | LU | 26.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/08] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4368738 (TERSTEEGEN BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,12,15,16 * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 29; figure - * [A] 6,13; | [XA]US4889529 (HAINDL HANS [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,12 * column 4, line 62 - column 7, line 4; figure - * [A] 6,7,13,14; | [A]EP0739639 (SAITO YOSHIKUNI [JP]) [A] 1* figure - * | by applicant | US5820570 | US5823973 |