EP1586319 - Thiadiazolidinones as GSK-3 inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noscira, S.A. Avenida de la Industria, 52 28760 Tres Cantos / ES | [2009/39] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Neuropharma S.A. Avenida de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinez, Gil Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 02 /
Dorronsoro Diaz, Isabel Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 03 /
Alonso Cascon, Mercedes Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 04 /
Panizodel Pliego, Gema Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 05 /
Fuertes Huerta, Ana Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 06 /
Perez Puerto, Maria José Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | 07 /
Medina Padilla, Miguel Avda. de la Industria 52 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2005/42] | ABG Patentes, S.L. C/Orense, 68 7th floor 28020 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05075779.8 | 04.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | EP20040075997 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04075997 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586319 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586319 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/433, C07D285/08, C07D417/04, A61P25/28, A61P3/10 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
C07D285/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/433 (KR);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | 07.04.2006 | BA | 07.04.2006 | HR | 07.04.2006 | LV | 07.04.2006 | MK | 07.04.2006 | YU | 07.04.2006 | Title | German: | Thiadiazolidinone als GSK3-Inhibitoren | [2005/42] | English: | Thiadiazolidinones as GSK-3 inhibitors | [2005/42] | French: | Thiadiazolidinones comme inhibiteurs de GSK-3 | [2009/18] |
Former [2005/42] | Thiazolidinones comme inhibiteurs de GSK-3 | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/15] | IT | 04.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO0185685 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al) [DY] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [DY] - MARTINEZ A ET AL., "First Non-ATP Competitive Glycogen Synthase Kinase 3.beta. (GSK-3.beta.) Inhibitors: Thiadiazolidinones (TDZD) as Potential Drugs for the Treatment of Alzheimer's Disease", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., (2002), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 1292 - 1299, XP002292084 [DY] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm011020u |