EP1553562 - Pitch marks management for speech synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/19] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Masayuki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05075801.0 | 05.03.1999 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | JP19980057250 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5725098 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1553562 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1553562 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553562 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00, G10L13/04 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
G10L13/10 (EP,US);
G10L13/04 (EP,US);
G10L13/07 (EP,US);
G10L19/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/28] | Title | German: | Verwaltung der Grundfrequenzmarkierungen für Sprachsynthese | [2005/28] | English: | Pitch marks management for speech synthesis | [2005/28] | French: | Gestion des marqueurs de fréquence fondamentale pour la synthèse de parole | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99301669.0 / EP0942408 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0696026 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 30 - line 34 * * page 6, line 3 - line 13 *; | [A] - GERSON I A ET AL, "TECHNIQUES FOR IMPROVING THE PERFORMANCE OF CELP-TYPE SPEECH CODERS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19920610), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8716, page 858-865, XP000274720 [A] 1-7 * page 861, column L, line 55 - line 58 * * page 861, column R, line 13 - line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.138990 | [A] - KORTEKAAS R W L ET AL, "Psychoacoustical evaluation of the pitch synchronous overlap and add speech-waveform manipulation technique using single-formant stimuli", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, ACOUST. SOC. AMERICA THROUGH AIP, USA, (199704), vol. 101, no. 4, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 2202 - 2213, XP002125680 [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * * section I.A The PSOLA technique * * section II.C Variation of the pitch-marker position * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.418204 | by applicant | EP0696026 |