EP1598223 - A thermally conditioned vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadle, Prasad S. 63 Sable Run East Amherst, NY 14051 / US | 02 /
Morelli, Donald T. 5903 Ridgewood Lane White Lake, MI 48383 / US | 03 /
Wolfe IV, Edward 51 Schoelles Amherst, NY 14228 / US | 04 /
Heremans, Joseph P. 2640 Lanergan Troy, Mi 48084 / US | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/47] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05076080.0 | 10.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | US20040948348 | 23.09.2004 Original published format: US 948348 | US20040577624P | 07.06.2004 Original published format: US 577624 P | US20040572691P | 20.05.2004 Original published format: US 572691 P | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598223 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598223 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598223 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60N2/56 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
B60N2/5657 (EP,US);
B60H1/00285 (EP,US);
B60H1/00478 (EP,US);
B60N2/5628 (EP,US);
B60H2001/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | Temperierter Fahrzeugsitz | [2005/47] | English: | A thermally conditioned vehicle seat | [2005/47] | French: | Siège de véhicule conditionné thermiquement | [2009/49] |
Former [2005/47] | Siège de véhicule conditionnée thermiquement | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2009 | BE | 02.12.2009 | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | IT | 02.12.2009 | LT | 02.12.2009 | NL | 02.12.2009 | PL | 02.12.2009 | RO | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | BG | 02.03.2010 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | IS | 02.04.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | IE | 10.05.2010 | LU | 10.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 10.05.2010 | ||
LU | 10.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 10.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 10.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 02.12.2009 | |
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 02.12.2009 | |
SE | 02.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5924766 (ESAKI HIDENORI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,10,18 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 13; figures 1,2,5 *; | [DA]US6079485 (ESAKI HIDENORI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,10,18 * column 2, line 62 - column 5, line 2 *; | [DA]US6119463 (BELL LON E [US]) [DA] 1,10,18 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 41; figures 1,3,7 *; | [A]WO0130606 (CHOI CHEOL HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1,10,18* figures 1-6 *; | [DXA]USRE38128E (GALLUP DAVID F [US], et al) [DX] 18,19 * column 1, line 1 - line 56 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 29 * * column 4, line 64 - column 7, line 59; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2,10 | by applicant | US5924766 | WO9958907 | US6079485 | USRE38128E |