EP1688705 - Combined gyroscope and 2-axis accelerometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEI Sensors & Systems Company, Inc. 13100 Telfair Avenue Sylmar California 91342 / US | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madni, Asad M. 3281 Woodbine Street Los Angeles, California 90064 / US | 02 /
Costlow, Lynn E. 260 Mountaire Parkway Clayton, California 94517 / US | 03 /
Wells, Roger F. 5410 Avenida Del Tren Yorba Linda, California 92887 / US | 04 /
Vuong, Jim B. 19761 Turtle Springs Wa Northridge, California 91326 / US | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Macpherson, Craig Stuart, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Macpherson, Craig Stuart, et al Page Hargrave, Southgate, Whitefriars, Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05076245.9 | 30.05.2005 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | US20050049036 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: US 49036 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1688705 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P15/14 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G01C19/5607 (EP,US);
G01P15/08 (EP,US);
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01P15/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kombination aus Gyrosokop und zweiachsigem Beschleunigungssensor | [2006/32] | English: | Combined gyroscope and 2-axis accelerometer | [2006/32] | French: | Combinaison d'un gyroscope et d'un accéléromètre à deux axes | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/23] | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |