EP1602939 - System for detection, location and identification according to the FM-CW principle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Parallelweg 2 7141 DC Groenlo / NL | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fockens, Tallienco Wieand Harm Kieftweg 1 7165 BR Rietmolen / NL | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/49] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05076301.0 | 03.06.2005 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | NL20041026338 | 04.06.2004 Original published format: NL 1026338 | [2005/49] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602939 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/75, G07C9/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
G01S13/756 (EP);
G01S13/345 (EP);
G01S13/003 (EP);
G01S13/878 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/33] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Detektion, Ortung und Identifizierung nach dem FM-CW Prinzip | [2005/49] | English: | System for detection, location and identification according to the FM-CW principle | [2005/49] | French: | Dispositif de détection, de localisation et d'identification selon le principe FM-CW | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 08.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5305008 (TURNER LEIGH H [AU], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 34 - line 68 ** column 3, line 6 - line 41 *; | [A]EP1365259 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] *; | [A]WO03102857 (MARCONI INTELLECTUAL PTY [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7 * page 3, line 1 - line 15 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 4 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 8 * * page 17, line 13 - page 19, line 18 * * figure 7 *; | [A]WO03107256 (BTG INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 33 * * page 4, line 16 - line 24 *; | [Y]US2004027240 (GREEFF ROY [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0013] , [0039] , [0042] , [0054] - [0056] - [0062] - [0064] *; | [Y] - VOSSIEK M ET AL, "PRECISE 3-D OBJECT POSITION TRACKING USING FMCW RADAR", 29TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. MUENCHEN, OCT. 5 - 7, 1999, PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, LONDON : MICROWAVE ENGINEERING EUROPE, GB, (19991005), VOL. 1 OF 3 CONF. 29, ISBN 0-86213-152-9, pages 234 - 237, XP009038799 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004027240 |