EP1743693 - EMULSIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/03] | Emulsifier | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coöperatie Avebe U.A. Prins Hendrikplein 20 9641 GK Veendam / NL | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Vries, Hendrik Jan Oosterdijsterweg 8 9551 TW Sellingen / NL | 02 /
Semeijn, Cindy Hanckemaborg 39 9722 WD Groningen / NL | 03 /
Buwalda, Pieter Lykle Mondriaanstraat 32 9718 MJ Groningen / NL | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/13] |
Former [2011/42] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/03] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05076605.4 | 12.07.2005 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743693 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1743693 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, C08B31/00, C08B31/02, C08B31/08, C08F2/24, A23L29/10, A23L29/219, A61K8/06, C08B31/04, C12P19/18, A61K8/73, A61K8/04, B01F17/00, D21H17/16, D21H17/17 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A23L29/10 (EP,US);
A23L29/219 (EP,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08B31/00 (EP,US);
C08B31/02 (EP,US);
C08B31/04 (EP,US);
C08B31/08 (EP,US);
C08F2/24 (EP,US);
C09K23/16 (EP,US);
C09K23/56 (EP,US);
C12P19/18 (EP,US);
C12Y204/01014 (EP,US);
C12Y204/01018 (EP,US);
C12Y204/01025 (EP,US);
C09K23/34 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/03] | B01F17/00, B01F17/56, A61K8/06, A61K8/04, A23L1/035, C08F2/30, D21H17/16, D21H17/17, A61K8/73, C08B31/04, C12P19/18, C12N9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 23.04.2007 | BA | 23.04.2007 | HR | 23.04.2007 | MK | 23.04.2007 | YU | 23.04.2007 | Title | German: | EMULGATOR | [2016/46] | English: | EMULSIFIER | [2016/46] | French: | ÉMULSIFIANT | [2016/46] |
Former [2007/03] | Emulgator | ||
Former [2007/03] | Emulsifier | ||
Former [2007/03] | Émulsifiant | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Observations by third parties | 19.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Observations by third parties | 18.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2005 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IE | 12.07.2017 | LU | 12.07.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.07.2005 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 12.07.2017 | ||
LU | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.07.2005 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 12.07.2017 | ||
LU | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 12.07.2017 | ||
LU | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 12.07.2017 | ||
LU | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 12.07.2017 | ||
LU | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4035235 (RICHARDS CHARLES N, et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [X]EP0332027 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 58 - page 7, line 31; examples 1-7; claims 1,3,5-7,9-12,14-20; table 1 *; | [A]EP0806434 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 43 - line 47; examples 11,12; claims 1,7 *; | [X]EP0913406 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1-21 * examples 2,13,14; claims 1,4,8,9,11,14,16,17,19,21,28 *; | [A]WO0116348 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 15, line 1 - line 8; examples 10-12; claims 1,2,6-10,17-19,24,25 *; | [A]WO03002728 (TNO [NL], et al) [A] 1,6-8,12,14,15 * page 6, line 3 - line 13; claims 1,2,6,10,13-22 * * page 9 * * page 12 * | Examination | JPH0481403 | US3565887 | US5854225 | WO0042076 | WO0058445 | - KAMETANI ET AL., "New Cyclodextrin Derivative comprises cyclic oligosaccharide residue bonded to e.g. carboxyl carboxylate ammonium salt.", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1992), vol. 1992, no. 17, Database accession no. 1992-138444, & JPH0481403 A 19920316 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | EP0189935 | WO8901043 | EP0418945 | WO9213962 | WO9424169 | EP0690170 | EP0689829 | US5776476 | EP0932444 | - R.L. WHISTLER, STARCH: CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1984), pages 143 - 144 | - D. DUCHÊNE, MINUTES OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CYCLODEXTRINS, SANTé, (1990), pages 19 - 61 | - A.R. HEDGES, MINUTES OF THE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CYCLODEXTRINS, SANTé, (1992), pages 23 - 58 | other | DE19610995 | EP1232189 | - MAAREL VAN DER M.J.E.C. ET AL, "Properties and applications of starch-converting enzymes of the alpha-amylase family", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20020101), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 137 - 155, XP002270826 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(01)00407-2 | - KAPER T. ET AL, "Exploring and exploiting starch-modifying amylomaltases from thermophiles", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (20040401), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 279 - 282, XP055101138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bst0320279 |