EP1598539 - Turbocharger and EGR System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills MI 48326-2872 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roby, Stephen I. 123 Windover Drive Asheville, NC 28803 / US | 02 /
McKinley, Steven R. 1206 Welland Drive Rochester, MI 48307 / US | [2009/25] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
Roby, Stephan I. 123 Windover Drive Asheville, NC 28803 / US | ||
02 /
McKinley, Steven R. 1206 Welland Drive Rochester, MI 48307 / US | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05076740.9 | 13.01.2000 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | US19990232361 | 15.01.1999 Original published format: US 232361 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598539 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598539 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02D21/08, F02D35/00, F02D23/00, F02M25/07 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F02B39/14 (EP,US);
F02D9/04 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/09 (EP,US);
F02M26/10 (EP,US);
F02M26/16 (EP,US);
F02M26/51 (EP,US);
F02M26/67 (EP,US);
F02M26/70 (EP,US);
F02M26/71 (EP,US);
F02B37/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/47] | Title | German: | Turbolader und EGR System | [2005/47] | English: | Turbocharger and EGR System | [2005/47] | French: | Turbocompresseur et systeme EGR | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 22.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00911581.7 / EP1144827 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5740785 (DICKEY DANIEL W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 *; | [X]US5771867 (AMSTUTZ ALOIS [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 7, lines 20-24; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9839563 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1* page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 9; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5806308 (KHAIR MAGDI K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 43; figure 1 *; | [PA]US6000222 (REGNIER BRIAN G [US]) [PA] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 56; figure - * |