EP1621490 - Variable-capacity store [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Thomas Marthastr. 50 20259 Hamburg / DE | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte Postfach 73 04 66 22124 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/38] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubes Allee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05077025.4 | 05.02.2003 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621490 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621490 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/51 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B65G47/5122 (EP,US);
B65G2207/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Speichereinrichtung mit variabler speicherkapazität | [2006/05] | English: | Variable-capacity store | [2006/05] | French: | Magasin à capacité variable | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 10.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T1117/08 | 31.05.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.06.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03090031.0 / EP1445218 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030090031) is 17.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2012
24.09.2013
WITHDRAWN International Tobacco Machinery Poland Ltd. Ul. Warsztatowa 19a 26-600 Radom / PL Opponents representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2012
24.09.2013
WITHDRAWN International Tobacco Machinery Poland Ltd. Ul. Warsztatowa 19a 26-600 Radom / PL Opponents representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2012
WITHDRAWN International Tobacco Machinery Poland Ltd. Ul. Warsztatowa 19a 26-600 Radom / PL Opponents representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | 27.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.12.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 18.10.2013 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2003 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | ES | 01.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | AT | 05.02.2012 | LU | 05.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
AT | 05.02.2012 | ||
LU | 05.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
AT | 05.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
AT | 05.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 21.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1059853 (INT TOBACCO MACHINERY POLAND [PL]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1273537 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO02085144 | EP1059853 |