EP1777997 - Method for preparing a conductive circuit device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIPEM Hackert GmbH Hammerbrücker Str. 4 08223 Grünbach / DE | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackert, Jürgen Hammerbrücker Strasse 4 08223 Grünbach / DE | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05077397.7 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777997 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/09 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
H05K3/24 (EP);
H05K3/246 (EP);
H05K2201/0257 (EP);
H05K2201/0347 (EP);
H05K2203/013 (EP);
H05K2203/0709 (EP);
H05K2203/0723 (EP);
H05K3/1216 (EP);
H05K3/125 (EP);
H05K3/182 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer leitenden Schaltungsanordnung | [2007/17] | English: | Method for preparing a conductive circuit device | [2007/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif d'un circuit conducteur | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3925578 (POLICHETTE JOSEPH, et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * examples 30,32 *; | [XA]US5882722 (KYDD PAUL H [US]) [X] 1-12 * claims 1-8 * [A] 13-25; | [XA]WO03009659 (UNIV BRUNEL [GB], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-4 * [A] 2-25; | [XA]WO03038002 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [X] 1 * pages 10,22; claims 25,26 * [A] 2-25; | [XA]US2004185388 (HIRAI HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,13 * claims 1-19 * [A] 2-12,14-25; | [A]US2005078158 (MAGDASSI SHLOMO [IL], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [A]WO2005047007 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [A] 13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005207930 (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIHIDE [JP]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |