EP1666794 - Air control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEM Energy Services B.V. Demmersweg 21 7556 BN Hengelo (OV) / NL | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Johannes Hermanus Mussenstraat 25 7557 BV Hengelo (OV) / NL | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2006/23] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05077717.6 | 30.11.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | NL20041027661 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: NL 1027661 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1666794 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/50, F23N5/08 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
F23G5/50 (EP);
F23N5/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | Luftsteuerung | [2006/23] | English: | Air control | [2006/23] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'air | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 02.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 03.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3847092 (GILBERT L) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US4621583 (KASKI KALEVI M [FI]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4953477 (MARTIN JOHANNES J E [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [X]FR2661733 (PERIN FRERES ETS [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0576955 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 27; figure . * [A] 2,3; | [X]EP0716266 (STAUDINGER GERNOT [AT]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5606924 (MARTIN JOHANNES J E [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 1 - line 9; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 * * column 4, line 39 - line 42 *; | [A]DE19931111 (ELECTROWATT TECH INNOVAT CORP [CH]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 24 - line 38; figure . *; | [A]DE9321618U (ERK ECKROHRKESSEL [DE]) [A] 5-7* the whole document * |