EP1676633 - Boron - Alumina catalyst support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [2007/48] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Southward, Barry W. 1317 Forest Lane Catoosa, OK 74015 / US | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/20] | Herrmann, Reinhard Umicore AG & Co. KG Patente Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05077772.1 | 05.12.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | US20040024068 | 28.12.2004 Original published format: US 24068 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1676633 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1676633 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/40, B01D53/94 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J21/02 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1026 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | Bor-modifizierter Aluminiumoxidkatalysatorträger | [2006/27] | English: | Boron - Alumina catalyst support | [2006/27] | French: | Support de catalyseur à base d'une alumine modifiée avec du bore | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 26.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001079416 ; | [X]JPH11165073 ; | [PA]JP2005279382 ; | [A]EP0645172 (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * * page 7, lines 25-28 *; | JPH11165073 [ ] (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | JP2001079416 [ ] (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [X]EP1468720 (ICT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11-13 * claims 1,6 * * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 5 *; | [PX]WO2005102513 (HTE AG THE HIGH THROUGHPUT EXP [DE], et al) [PX] 1-13 * claims 1-5,7,9,14,16,19,20 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001079416 A 20010327 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE & TECHNOL; CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO LTD; YOSHIMUR) [X] 1,5,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11165073 A 19990622 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO LTD) [X] 1,5,9,10 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005279382 A 20051013 (NIPPON OIL CORP) [PA] 1 * abstract * |