EP1804433 - Initialization of a wireless communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blangé, Marinus Johannes Withof 19 2631 SM Nootdorp / NL | 02 /
Djurica, Miodrag Schepenstraat 7c 3039 NA Rotterdam / NL | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05078044.4 | 30.12.2005 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804433 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/26 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (KR);
H04W40/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/11] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | InitiaIisierung eines drahtlosen Kommunikationsnetzes | [2007/27] | English: | Initialization of a wireless communication network | [2007/27] | French: | Initialisation d' un réseau de communication sans fil | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2003151513 (HERRMANN FALK [US], et al) [YD] 1,11,16 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0026] , [0038] - [0044] - [0046] , [0058] , [0059] , [0070] * [Y] 2,3,7,12,17; | [Y]EP1471693 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2,3,7,12,17 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] , [0016] - [0021] *; | [Y]US2005122927 (WENTINK MENZO [NL]) [Y] 1,11,16 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0054] - [0057] - [0065] *; | [XA] - RUBIN I ET AL, "TBONE: a mobile-backbone protocol for ad hoc wireless networks", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 2002. IEEE MAR 9-16, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020309), vol. 6, ISBN 0-7803-7231-X, pages 2727 - 2740, XP010604843 [X] 1,4-6,9-11,16 * paragraphs A.1, A.1.3 * * page 2727, column L * [A] 2,3,7,8,12,13,17-20 | [A] - FORNO F ET AL, "Design and implementation of a Bluetooth ad hoc network for indoor positioning - Microsoft Research embedded systems", IEE PROCEEDINGS: SOFTWARE, IEE, STEVENAGE, GB, (20051007), vol. 152, no. 5, ISSN 1462-5970, pages 223 - 228, XP006025005 [A] 2,17 * paragraphs 2 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-sen:20045027 |