EP1790308 - Probe, method and kit and their use for apical sealing of a tooth root channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walther, Thomas Danziger Strasse 193 10407 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Lietzau, Markus Berlepschstrasse 65 14165 Berlin / DE | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Boeckh, Tobias Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Boeckh, Tobias HERTIN Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05090327.7 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790308 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/04, A61C5/02 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A61C5/50 (EP);
A61C2201/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sonde, Verfahren und Kit und ihre Verwendung zum apikalen Abdichten eines Zahnwurzelkanals | [2007/22] | English: | Probe, method and kit and their use for apical sealing of a tooth root channel | [2007/22] | French: | Sonde, procédé et kit et leur utilisation pour rendre étanche l'extrémité apicale d'un canal radiculaire dentaire | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3318000 (LAWRENCE PARIS) [X] 1 * column 1 - column 2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-4; | [X]US3908270 (FISHMAN MARK J) [X] 1-4 * column 3 * * figures 2,6 *; | [XA]USRE35070E (FITZMORRIS BERNARD A [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 47 * * column 5, line 26 - line 52 * * column 7, line 10 - column 11, line 7 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 2-4; | [A]US6162202 (SICURELLI ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001009755 (FISCHER DAN E [US]) [A] 10* the whole document * |