EP1554920 - Dual power path drive for a rotor of an agricultural harvester and method for decelerating the rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Talbi, Aziz 3617 E. 59 Court 52807, Davenport, IA Iowa / US | 02 /
Ho, Yun-Ren 1436 Chelsea Lane 60565, Naperville, IL Illinois / US | 03 /
Brome, John G. 1420 Birchwood Street 53115, Delevan, WI Wisconsin / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | CNH IP Department c/o CNH Belgium NV, Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 05100187.3 | 13.01.2005 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | US20040756857 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: US 756857 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554920 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554920 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127, F16H47/04 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP,US);
A01D41/1274 (EP,US);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | Zweiwegeantrieb für eine Trommel einer Erntemaschine und Verfahren zum Trommelverzögern | [2005/29] | English: | Dual power path drive for a rotor of an agricultural harvester and method for decelerating the rotor | [2005/29] | French: | Transmission à double source de puissance pour un tambour d'une récolteuse et méthode pour la décélération du tambour | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2008 | CY | 26.11.2008 | CZ | 26.11.2008 | DK | 26.11.2008 | EE | 26.11.2008 | FI | 26.11.2008 | LT | 26.11.2008 | NL | 26.11.2008 | PL | 26.11.2008 | RO | 26.11.2008 | SI | 26.11.2008 | SK | 26.11.2008 | TR | 26.11.2008 | IE | 13.01.2009 | LU | 13.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | BG | 26.02.2009 | SE | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | ES | 08.03.2009 | IS | 26.03.2009 | PT | 27.04.2009 | HU | 27.05.2009 | [2018/11] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CY | 26.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
TR | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 13.01.2009 | ||
LU | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
HU | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 13.01.2009 | ||
LU | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
HU | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 13.01.2009 | ||
IT | 13.01.2009 | ||
LU | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 13.01.2009 | ||
IT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
RO | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
SK | 26.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
PL | 26.11.2008 | ||
SI | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
LT | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
IS | 26.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 26.11.2008 | |
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 08.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6052978 (KEMPF BERND [DE]) [A] 1,12,13,15 * column 2, line 29 - line 44 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 45 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6105353 (MOHR JAN-HENDRIK [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,13 * column 4, line 7 - line 45 * * column 5, line 27 - line 34 ** figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP1072817 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) [DA] 1,3,9-12,14 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6663525 (MCKEE KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 1,3,8-15 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 37 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 16 * * claim 8 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1371279 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE]) [A] 1,9-11,14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0041] , [0049] , [0050] * * figure 2 * |