EP1555353 - Cover assembly for an inspection opening, in particular a wall inspection opening, of a lavatory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALSIR S.p.A. Località Merlaro, 2 25078 Vestone (BS) / IT | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varotti, Mario Via Mocenigo, 100 25078 Vestone / IT | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05100194.9 | 14.01.2005 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | IT2004MI00045 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: IT MI20040045 | [2005/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555353 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555353 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/012 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
E03D5/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/41] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Deckelanordnung für eine Serviceöffnung, insbesondere für die Serviceöffnung einer Toilette | [2005/29] | English: | Cover assembly for an inspection opening, in particular a wall inspection opening, of a lavatory | [2005/29] | French: | Ensemble de couvercle pour une ouverture de service, en particulier une ouverture de service de toilettes | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4175781 (DUMORTIER ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1-7,9* figure - *; | [Y]CH686581 (KOFEL FERDINAND [CH]) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 9 - line 13; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE19541653 (AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE]) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 15 - line 44; figure - *; | [DXY]EP0866183 (GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH]) [DX] 1-9,11 * the whole document * [Y] 8,10 | by applicant | EP0866183 |