EP1584364 - Shooting game apparatus, storage medium storing game program and game controlling method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Limited 11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Yoshio Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Yamano, Katsuya Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05100318.4 | 19.01.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | JP20040026209 | 03.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004026209 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584364 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584364 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/10 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/837 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/58 (US);
A63F13/92 (US);
A63F2300/204 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/08] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schiessspielvorrichtung, Aufzeichnungsmedium für Schiessspielprogramm und Spielkontrollverfahren | [2005/41] | English: | Shooting game apparatus, storage medium storing game program and game controlling method | [2005/41] | French: | Appareil de jeu de tir, support d'enregistrement pour programme de jeu de tir et méthode de contrôle de jeu | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 14.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4938483 (YAVETZ IDO [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 10, line 61 - line 63 *; | [A]EP1047022 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] ** paragraph [0079] *; | [A]US2001029202 (KONDO TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0154] *; | [X]US6306036 (BURNS PATRICK [GB], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 51 - line 59 * * column 6, line 34 - line 43 * * column 8, line 27 - line 30 *; | [A]US6319119 (KONOE YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 9, line 20 - line 25 * |