EP1686754 - Synchronizing Server and Device Data Using Device Data Schema [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linkert, Barry 207 Woodridge Drive RR2 Petersburg, Ontario N0B 2H0 / CA | 02 /
Zhu, Jie 215-215 Victoria Street South Kitchener, Ontario N2G 4Z7 / CA | 03 /
Omar, Salim 5-460 Beechwood Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 1Z1 / CA | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Rickard, David John, et al ipulse 9-10 Savile Row London W1S 3PF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05100635.1 | 31.01.2005 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686754 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686754 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F17/30 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
H04L67/04 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/31] | H04L29/06, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | 24.02.2005 | BA | 24.02.2005 | HR | 24.02.2005 | LV | 24.02.2005 | MK | 24.02.2005 | YU | 24.02.2005 | Title | German: | Synchronisation von Server- und Geräte-Daten unter Benutzung von Geräte-Daten-Schemata | [2006/31] | English: | Synchronizing Server and Device Data Using Device Data Schema | [2006/31] | French: | Synchronisation de données d'un serveur et d'un dispositif en utilisant des données schématique du dispositif | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2005 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 08.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2008 | BE | 16.01.2008 | CH | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | CZ | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | LI | 16.01.2008 | LT | 16.01.2008 | NL | 16.01.2008 | PL | 16.01.2008 | RO | 16.01.2008 | SI | 16.01.2008 | SK | 16.01.2008 | TR | 16.01.2008 | IE | 31.01.2008 | LU | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | BG | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | IS | 16.05.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | HU | 17.07.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
TR | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 16.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6272545 (FLANAGIN STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-57 * column 2, line 18 - line 33 * * column 8, line 10 - line 45; figure 5 * * column 12, line 49 - column 13, line 46; figure 6 * * column 14, line 12 - column 15, line 30 *; | [X]WO0169435 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-57 * page 2, line 3 - line 31 * * page 3, line 13 - line 32 * * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 30 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO02054236 (SYNCHROLOGIC INC [US]) [A] 1-57 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 6 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 20 * * page 17, line 5 - page 19, line 2; figures 3B,4,5 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2004025072 (MAU LOUIS S [US]) [A] 1-57 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [X]US2004224672 (LINKERT BARRY [CA], et al) [X] 1-57 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0058] , [0059]; figures 2,3 *; | [A] - SESHADRI P ET AL, "SQLServer for Windows CE-a database engine for mobile and embedded platforms", DATA ENGINEERING, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 29 FEB.-3 MARCH 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000229), ISBN 0-7695-0506-6, pages 642 - 644, XP010378761 [A] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2000.839481 |