EP1580092 - Camera in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haug, Karsten Eisenbahnstrasse 44/1 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/39] | Application number, filing date | 05100746.6 | 03.02.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | DE20041015040 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004015040 | [2005/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1580092 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1580092 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1580092 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
G03B19/023 (EP);
B60R1/30 (EP,US);
B60R1/23 (EP,US);
B60S1/0822 (EP);
B60S1/0844 (EP);
G03B15/05 (EP);
G03B17/02 (EP);
G06V20/56 (EP);
H04N23/56 (EP);
H04N23/74 (EP);
B60R2300/106 (EP);
B60R2300/108 (EP);
B60R2300/205 (EP);
B60R2300/804 (EP);
B60R2300/8053 (EP);
B60R2300/8066 (EP);
G03B2215/0503 (EP);
G03B2215/0592 (EP);
G03B2217/002 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2015/39] |
Former [2006/41] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kamera in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2005/39] | English: | Camera in a vehicle | [2005/39] | French: | Caméra pour un véhicule automobile | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | [2016/21] |
Former [2016/11] | SE | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001153969 ; | [X]WO2004007255 (TRW LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * page 2, paragraph 2; figure - * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 1 *; | [E]EP1507138 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4,6-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001153969 A 20010608 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4032927 | DE19704818 | EP0832798 | DE19749331 | WO03002388 |