EP1562063 - Night Vision System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shaffer, Aric, David 5078 Bosuns Way, B1 Ypsilanti, MI Michigan 48197 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05100800.1 | 04.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | US20040708037 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: US 708037 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562063 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562063 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/12, B60R1/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
B60R1/30 (EP,US);
B60R1/23 (EP,US);
G02B23/12 (EP,US);
B60R2300/103 (EP,US);
B60R2300/106 (EP,US);
B60R2300/50 (EP,US);
B60R2300/8066 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2006/18] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nachtsichtsystem | [2005/32] | English: | Night Vision System | [2005/32] | French: | Système de vision de nuit | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5923243 (BLEINER THOMAS [MC]) [A] 9* column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 2 *; | [XA]US2001050340 (HOLZ MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] - [0031] - [0035] * * claims 1,4,5 * [A] 6,8; | [XA]DE10033103 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] - [0019] * [A] 5,9; | [PX]EP1392054 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [PX] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0029] - [0061] *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Anti-blinding scheme for near-infrared diode-laser-based active night-vison", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200012), vol. 440, no. 103, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007127288 [X] 1 * the whole document * |