blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1585363

EP1585363 - Improved audio frequency speaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2012
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2012Change - withdrawalpublished on 11.07.2012  [2012/28]
08.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2012  [2012/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIBRATION-X di Bianchini Emanuele e C. Sas
Viale dei Comunali, 32
33078 SAN VITO AL TAGLIAMENTO (PN) / IT
[2005/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Bianchini, Emanuele
2 Eaton Court
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
 [2005/41]
Representative(s)Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al
GLP Srl Piazzale Cavedalis, 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date05101323.322.02.2005
[2005/41]
Priority number, dateUS20040547209P24.02.2004         Original published format: US 547209 P
[2005/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1585363
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1585363
Date:18.01.2006
[2006/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04R1/24
[2006/03]
CPC:
H04R1/24 (EP,US); H04R23/02 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2005/41]H04R3/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/41]
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Audiofrequenz-Lautsprecher[2005/41]
English:Improved audio frequency speaker[2005/41]
French:Haut-parleur audiofréquence amélioré[2005/41]
Examination procedure17.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
24.07.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/23]
deletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/28]
06.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/28]
13.12.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/28]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200804   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.200905   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.201006   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.201107   M06   Not yet paid
29.02.201208   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS5912699  ;
 [X]JPS6027300  ;
 [X]JPS5591299  ;
 [A]US3423543  (KOMPANEK HARRY W) [A] 8-11* column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US4554414  (HOUSE WILLIAM N [US]) [X] 1,2,8-13,15 * column 2, line 58 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-7 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840502), vol. 008, no. 095, Database accession no. (E - 242), & JP59012699 A 19840123 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1-3,7,11-14 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850621), vol. 009, no. 147, Database accession no. (E - 323), & JP60027300 A 19850212 (FUOSUTAA DENKI KK) [X] 1,3-7,11,12,14 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801004), vol. 004, no. 141, Database accession no. (E - 028), & JP55091299 A 19800710 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,3,7,11 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.