EP1582739 - Radial piston pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nigrin, Uwe Bussardweg 28 98693, Ilmenau / DE | [2005/40] | Application number, filing date | 05101669.9 | 04.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | DE20041015263 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004015263 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582739 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582739 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
F04B1/0404 (EP);
F04B1/0421 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/10] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radialkolbenpumpe | [2005/40] | English: | Radial piston pump | [2005/40] | French: | Pompe à pistons radiaux | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11294292 (DENSO CORP, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP1028252 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]DE19927826 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE10228551 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * the whole document ** claim 1 * | by applicant | DE19729789 |