EP1574308 - Milling tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STARK S.p.A. Strada Triestina, 8 I-33050 Trivignano Udinese (Udine) / IT | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filiputti, Alberto Via Casali, 76/B2 33048, SAN GIOVANNI AL NATISONE (UD) / IT | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Petraz, Davide Luigi GLP Srl Piazzale Cavedalis, 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 05101789.5 | 08.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | IT2004UD00043 | 09.03.2004 Original published format: IT UD20040043 | IT2004UD00148 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: IT UD20040148 | [2005/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574308 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574308 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B27G13/04, B27G13/10 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B27G13/04 (EP);
B27G13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/29] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fräswerkzeug | [2005/37] | English: | Milling tool | [2005/37] | French: | Outil de fraisage | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.07.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2552876 (GREINER GMBH & CO) [A] 1,2* page 10, paragraph 2; figure 7 *; | [X]FR2443318 (CAUMETTE GEORGES) [X] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6004079 (KISLINGER HEINRICH [AT]) [X] 1,6-8 * abstract *; | [X]EP1013385 (REKORD S R L [IT]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figure - * |