EP1574437 - Method and device for finishing cellophane-wrapped packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORIANI, Silvano Via Varolio, 17 40100 Bologna / IT | 02 /
NEGRINI, Stefano Via Longarola, 21 40012 Calderara di Reno / IT | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
BORIANI, Silvano Via Varolio, 17 40100, BOLOGNA / IT | ||
02 /
NEGRINI, Stefano Via Longarola, 21 40012, CALDERARA DI RENO / IT | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05101858.8 | 10.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | IT2004BO00137 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: IT BO20040137 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574437 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B53/02, B65B19/22 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B65B53/02 (EP,US);
B65B19/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Glätten von in Folie eingewickelten Päckchen | [2005/37] | English: | Method and device for finishing cellophane-wrapped packets | [2005/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le lissage de paquets enveloppés dans une feuille | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE3824924 (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 3, lines 37-65; figure 5 * [A] 3-8,10,13-18,20 [Y] 9,19; | [YD]US5462401 (BRIZZI MARCO [IT], et al) [YD] 9,19 * column 3, lines 37-47; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0941929 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]) [A] 1,11* abstract *; | [XD]US6511405 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [XD] 1,11 * column 3, lines 47-58; figures 2-5 * |