blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1580232

EP1580232 - Pneumatic tire having built-in colored sealant layer and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street Akron
Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street Akron
Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Reiter, Leonard James
4207 Helmick Avenue
44203 Norton, Ohio / US
02 / Balogh, George Frank
8200 Winterwood Avenue NW
44720 North Canton, Ohio / US
03 / Crawford, Michael Julian
712 Palisades Drive
Akron, OH Ohio 44303 / US
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A.
Patent Department
Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A., Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
Application number, filing date05101870.310.03.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateUS2004080290817.03.2004         Original published format: US 802908
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1580232
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1580232
Date:22.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:C08L23/22, C08K5/06, B29C73/16, B60C19/12, B29C73/22, B29D30/00
[2005/39]
CPC:
B29D30/0681 (EP,US); B29C73/163 (EP,US); B29C73/22 (EP,US);
B29D30/0685 (EP,US); B60C1/0008 (EP,US); B60C5/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/22 (EP,US); B29D2030/0682 (EP,US); B29D2030/069 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US); C08K3/013 (EP,US); C08L2312/00 (EP,US);
C08L3/00 (EP,US); C08L9/00 (EP,US); Y10T152/10675 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10684 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L23/22, C08L2666/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   TR [2006/24]
Former [2005/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Luftreifen mit eingebauter gefärbter Dichtungsschicht und seine Herstellung[2005/39]
English:Pneumatic tire having built-in colored sealant layer and preparation thereof[2005/39]
French:Pneumatique contenant une étanche colorée et son procédé de préparation[2005/39]
Examination procedure28.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/21]
26.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2006Fee for grant paid
05.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipTR22.11.2006
ES05.03.2007
[2009/45]
Former [2007/44]ES05.03.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0135463  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5059636  (GRENGA PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1182058  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03027204  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US2003230376  (SMITH DAVID MICHAEL [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1433830  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.