EP1577793 - Systems and methods for spell checking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brill, Eric D. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Cucerzan, Silviu-Petru c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05101951.1 | 14.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | US20040801968 | 16.03.2004 Original published format: US 801968 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1577793 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1577793 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G06F16/9532 (EP,US);
G06F40/232 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
B63B2221/08 (KR);
B63C2005/022 (KR);
F16B5/02 (KR);
G06F16/3322 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | Rechtschreibprüfungverfahren und -systeme | [2005/38] | English: | Systems and methods for spell checking | [2005/38] | French: | Systèmes et dispositifs de vérification de l'orthographie | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0004465 (AMAZON COM [US]) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 27 * * page 7, line 11 - line 21 *; | [A]US2002152204 (ORTEGA RUBEN ERNESTO [US], et al) [A] 1-42* abstract * |