Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
02.11.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.04.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.03.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.01.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.11.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.09.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.07.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.03.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2007 | First examination report | |
06.03.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.06.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] |
07.04.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
23.09.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
16.09.2005 | Change - German title | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
05.08.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |